This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2020 at 00:32:38 (UTC).

THOMAS SHERWOOD VS LYFT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2018 THOMAS SHERWOOD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LYFT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9282

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SHERWOOD THOMAS

Defendants and Respondents

DAHDOUH DORIS FRANCOIS

LYFT INC.

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FELDMAN JUSTIN D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DIZON JECK

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/3/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Request for Dismissal

6/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

1/30/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

1/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

12/26/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Demand for Jury Trial

2/1/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

2/1/2019: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/1/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Demand for Jury Trial

2/1/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/1/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Answer

2/1/2019: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/27/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/14/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

6/1/2018: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/1/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

3/22/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/22/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS -

3/22/2018: SUMMONS -

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Thomas Sherwood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant); Doris Francois Dahdouh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial ((1x6mos)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketMotion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant); Doris Francois Dahdouh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Thomas Sherwood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Thomas Sherwood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Thomas Sherwood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC699282    Hearing Date: January 31, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Defendants seek to continue trial from March 23, 2020 to August 24, 2020. Plaintiff filed this case on March 22, 2018 concerning a motor vehicle collision on March 22, 2016. The parties previously stipulated to a six month continuance. Defendant now argues another continuance is necessary because the parties have not completed discovery, and they have a mediation date scheduled for June 5, 2020. Plaintiff has stipulated to the August 24, 2020 trial date and did not oppose the motion.

To accommodate the June 5, 2020 mediation date, the Court finds there is good cause to continue the trial to August 24, 2020. The Court GRANTS the motion and continues the trial to August 24, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. The Final Status Conference is continued to August 10, 2020. All dates are based on the new trial date. The parties are ordered to inform all witnesses and experts of the new trial date immediately. The Court has granted this continuance to the date jointly selected by parties. The Court presumes the date has been cleared with the parties, counsel and experts, and grants the continuance in reliance on the implicit representation that the parties, counsel and experts will be available on the date of trial and day-to-day thereafter for the length of the trial plus a five-day trailing period. No further continuances should be expected.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.