This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2022 at 18:38:59 (UTC).

THOMAS PETER VS THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA DOMESTIC NONPROFIT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 THOMAS PETER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA DOMESTIC NONPROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0585

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETER THOMAS

Defendants

REYNOLDS JAMES

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA DOMESTIC NONPROFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EBRAHIMIAN ARIE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/23/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/6/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/6/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Thomas Peter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Thomas Peter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Thomas Peter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant