Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2021 at 03:16:07 (UTC).

THOMAS OWENS VS GWENDOLYN WASHINGTON

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 THOMAS OWENS filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GWENDOLYN WASHINGTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3865

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OWENS THOMAS

Defendant

WASHINGTON GWENDOLYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ELDESSOUKY MOHAMED

GARCIA MARIA E

Defendant Attorney

YUN CHARLES C.

 

Court Documents

Answer

12/23/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

12/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

12/28/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/16/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2023
  • Hearing11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Hearing05/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Hearing05/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gwendolyn Washington (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Thomas Owens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Thomas Owens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Thomas Owens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YUN CHARLES C. ESQ.