This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 07:52:56 (UTC).

THOMAS MCKENZIE VS GUILLERMO CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 THOMAS MCKENZIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GUILLERMO CHAVEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD B. MORETON and WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3566

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCKENZIE THOMAS

Defendant

CHAVEZ GUILLERMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECKER TODD B.

Defendant Attorneys

SEEGER MARTIN

GARIBAY JAVIER

SEEGER MARTIN LESLEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

8/30/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/31/2021

8/31/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/31/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/24/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER ON STIPULATION TO AMEND ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/31/2020: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER ON STIPULATION TO AMEND ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer

9/1/2020: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO AMEND ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/3/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO AMEND ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Association of Attorney

6/19/2020: Association of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/25/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/5/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

3/20/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

3/20/2020: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/23/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/12/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/3/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • Hearing11/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal after Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 11:17 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/31/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Thomas McKenzie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Thomas McKenzie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Guillermo Chavez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Guillermo Chavez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Guillermo Chavez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Thomas McKenzie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Thomas McKenzie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Thomas McKenzie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Thomas McKenzie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEEGER MARTIN