This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2023 at 06:08:57 (UTC).

THOMAS LEAPER, ET AL. VS 10620 LANDALE AVENUE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA UNINCORPORATED NON-PROFIT NUTUAL BENEFIT ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 THOMAS LEAPER, filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 10620 LANDALE AVENUE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA UNINCORPORATED NON-PROFIT NUTUAL BENEFIT ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK M. TAVELMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0397

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FRANK M. TAVELMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEAPER LESLEY

LEAPER THOMAS

Defendant

10620 LANDALE AVENUE OWNERS ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA UNINCORPORATED NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWETT TIMOTHY MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

SHAPIRO MARC S

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

1/3/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/27/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

10/27/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Appearance

10/25/2022: Notice of Appearance

Case Management Statement

10/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/10/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/5/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/18/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

7/19/2022: Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

Proof of Personal Service

7/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/8/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/8/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

6/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

6/28/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/6/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2023
  • Hearing10/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2023
  • Hearing10/05/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of Status Conference; Filed by: Thomas Leaper (Plaintiff); Lesley Leaper (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Status Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 03/20/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/05/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Thomas Leaper (Plaintiff); Lesley Leaper (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Burbank Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Frank M. Tavelmaneffective 06/20/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. John J. Kralik in Department A Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Thomas Leaper (Plaintiff); Lesley Leaper (Plaintiff); As to: 10620 Landale Avenue Owners Association, a California Unincorporated non-profit nutual benefit association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Thomas Leaper (Plaintiff); Lesley Leaper (Plaintiff); As to: 10620 Landale Avenue Owners Association, a California Unincorporated non-profit nutual benefit association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less