This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2023 at 11:33:17 (UTC).

THOMAS LANE CLARK III VS WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 THOMAS LANE CLARK III filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0285

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARK III THOMAS LANE

Defendants

DOE SECURITY COMPANY BUSINESS ENTITY UNKNOWN

PERLMUTTER AN INDIVIDUAL JOSH

WESTFIELD TOPANGA AND THE VILLAGE A BUSINESS ENTITY UNKNOWN

WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER LLC

ALLIED UNIVERSAL SERVICES SECURITY COMPANY

Cross Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE LP DBA ALLIED UNIVERSAL SECURITY SERVICES

Cross Defendant and Defendant

PERLMUTTER AN INDIVIDUAL JOSH

Not Classified By Court

CALIFORNIA VICTIM COMPENSATION BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KONSTAD ANDREA LOREEN

PIRNIA ARDY

Defendant Attorneys

HUNT KATHLEEN ANNE

THOMPSON DENISE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/11/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

8/4/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

7/31/2023: Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Lien

7/27/2023: Notice of Lien

Case Management Statement

7/27/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/12/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

6/28/2023: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/28/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

5/25/2023: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

5/19/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/19/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

5/9/2023: Case Management Statement

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/9/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Case Management Statement

5/8/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO STRIKE ATTORNEY'S FEES FROM PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR

3/23/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO STRIKE ATTORNEY'S FEES FROM PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2023
  • Hearing12/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2023
  • Hearing12/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: THOMAS LANE CLARK III (Plaintiff); As to: JOSH PERLMUTTER, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Cross-Complaint: As To Parties changed from JOSH PERLMUTTER, an individual (Defendant) to JOSH PERLMUTTER, an individual (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Universal Protection Service, LP DBA Allied Universal Security Services (Cross-Complainant); As to: JOSH PERLMUTTER, an individual (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketAddress for Kathleen Anne Hunt (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Universal Protection Service, LP DBA Allied Universal Security Services Erroneously Sued As Allied Universal Services Security Company (Defendant); As to: JOSH PERLMUTTER, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 12/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default scheduled for 12/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: THOMAS LANE CLARK III (Plaintiff); As to: WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER LLC (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: THOMAS LANE CLARK III (Plaintiff); As to: WESTFIELD TOPANGA AND THE VILLAGE, a business entity unknown (Defendant); Service Cost: 112.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Virginia Keeny in Department W Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: THOMAS LANE CLARK III (Plaintiff); As to: WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER LLC (Defendant); WESTFIELD TOPANGA AND THE VILLAGE, a business entity unknown (Defendant); DOE SECURITY COMPANY, business entity unknown (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: THOMAS LANE CLARK III (Plaintiff); As to: WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER LLC (Defendant); WESTFIELD TOPANGA AND THE VILLAGE, a business entity unknown (Defendant); DOE SECURITY COMPANY, business entity unknown (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THOMAS LANE CLARK III (Plaintiff); As to: WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER LLC (Defendant); WESTFIELD TOPANGA AND THE VILLAGE, a business entity unknown (Defendant); DOE SECURITY COMPANY, business entity unknown (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less