This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2020 at 02:53:27 (UTC).

THOMAS & KIMBERLY INOCENTE, ET AL. VS KB HOME, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 THOMAS KIMBERLY INOCENTE filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5822

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INOCENTE THOMAS & KIMBERLY

NICOLE HANNASCH & ANTHONY SALSEDO

HOLLINGSORTH NICHOLAS & NICOLE

ISHUNINOV ANDRIY

DEFRAITES SYDNEY & ANGELA

DUARTE LUIS

BRIONES ABBIGAIL

PAUL CHERRY & MARCIA COOPER

DESAI PURAV & AVANU

WILLIAMS TIFFANY & DEVIN

CARTER TRAVIS & MARIKA

KHASDAEI ALI

SENIKA LEVIAS & KEVIN SHIELDS

READE ERIC & KAREN

SHANNON KEMP & NICOLE KINGSTON

TAYLOR FLORIN

MARLO & WENDY OXCIANO

ROMMEL & RUBY GALANTO

Defendants

KB HOME

KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLYE ANNEKE J.

Defendant Attorney

SCHNEIDER DANIEL SETH

 

Court Documents

Other - - JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

4/16/2020: Other - - JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/25/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE) OF 04/23/2020

Case Management Statement

3/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

1/23/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

11/7/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

9/4/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE PURSUANT TO RIGHT TOO REPAIR ACT (SB800)

4/12/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE PURSUANT TO RIGHT TOO REPAIR ACT (SB800)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Summons - Summons on First Amended Complaint

1/18/2019: Summons - Summons on First Amended Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Initial Status Conference Order]

2/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Initial Status Conference Order]

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/20/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/20/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court's Ruling Re Complex Determination)

12/12/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court's Ruling Re Complex Determination)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court's Ruling Re Complex Determination) of 12/12/2018

12/12/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court's Ruling Re Complex Determination) of 12/12/2018

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • Hearing09/15/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 09:14 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance of Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (re Compliance to E-Service Order) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docketat 1:11 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re E-Service Provider)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re E-Service Provider) of 06/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Initial Status Conference Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketSummons on First Amended Complaint; Filed by Thomas & Kimberly Inocente (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court's Ruling Re Complex Determination) of 12/12/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court's Ruling Re Complex Determination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Thomas & Kimberly Inocente (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint for Damages; Filed by Thomas & Kimberly Inocente (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint for Damages; Filed by Thomas & Kimberly Inocente (Plaintiff); Nicole Hannasch & Anthony Salsedo (Plaintiff); Paul Cherry & Marcia Cooper (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less