This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 03:52:15 (UTC).

THOMAS GALINDO VS STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 THOMAS GALINDO filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1617

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GALINDO THOMAS

Respondent

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FURTADO DAVID

Respondent Attorneys

TOMAINO DOMINIQUE

MCGUIRE MICHAEL JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/16/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

2/8/2021: Answer

Order - ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO FILE SECOND AMENDMENT

1/14/2021: Order - ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO FILE SECOND AMENDMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. MCGUIRE RE: MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE AS REQUIRED BY AS REQUIRED BY CCP 435.5 (A)(2)

11/16/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. MCGUIRE RE: MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE AS REQUIRED BY AS REQUIRED BY CCP 435.5 (A)(2)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/16/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Case Management Statement

9/25/2020: Case Management Statement

Reply - REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF TOMAS GALINDOS COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

9/25/2020: Reply - REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF TOMAS GALINDOS COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/25/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

10/2/2020: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) / FI...)

10/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) / FI...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. MCGUIRE RE: MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE AS REQUIRED BY AS REQUIRED BY CCP 430.41(A)(2) AND 435.5 (A)(2)

6/30/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. MCGUIRE RE: MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE AS REQUIRED BY AS REQUIRED BY CCP 430.41(A)(2) AND 435.5 (A)(2)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

6/30/2020: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

6/30/2020: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/6/2020: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

7/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Proof of Personal Service

5/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

5/7/2020: Complaint

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • Hearing07/29/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Thomas Galindo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketMemorandum (of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Thomas Galindo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF MICHAEL J. MCGUIRE RE: MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE AS REQUIRED BY AS REQUIRED BY CCP 430.41(a)(2) AND 435.5 (a)(2)); Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Thomas Galindo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Thomas Galindo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Thomas Galindo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Thomas Galindo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGUIRE MICHAEL JOHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOMAINO DOMINIQUE