This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 16:45:43 (UTC).

THOMAS ERNST VS JAVIER GONZALEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 THOMAS ERNST filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAVIER GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3645

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERNST THOMAS

Defendants

GONZALEZ JAVIER

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLAND DEREK C

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/13/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2024
  • Hearing09/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by THOMAS ERNST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by THOMAS ERNST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by THOMAS ERNST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLLAND DEREK C