This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 13:47:14 (UTC).

THOMAS EMENS VS CALIFORNIA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 THOMAS EMENS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALIFORNIA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3908

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Respondents

EMENS THOMAS

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SAN JOSE

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

CALIFORNIA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE OF BISHOPS

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHIBISHOP OF LOS

CALIFORNIA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE

THE CALIFORNIA CATHOLIC CONFERENCE INC.

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES

DIOCESE OF SANTA ROSA

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SANTA ROSA

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SACRAMENTO

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF FRESNO

ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SAN

THE DIOCESE OF SAN DIEGO

THE CATHOLIC BISHOP OF CHICAGO

DIOCESE OF FRESNO

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOOP OF ORANGE

DIOCESE OF SAN BERNARDINO

DIOCESE OF ORANGE

DIOCESE OF OAKLAND

EMENS THOMAS

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SAN JOSE

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

SALDANA MANUEL

GREENE STEPHEN J. JR

GASPARI PAUL E.

WEISS JASON A.

DELEHUNT MICHAEL E.

MORAN ADRIENNE M.

FINNEGAN MICHAEL G.

FINNEGAN MICHAEL GEORGE

RECK MICHAEL

LEMANN WILFRID C.

OLLER MART B. IV

DELEHUNT MICHAEL EDWARD

HENNIGAN JAMES M.

BLEASE JEFFREY

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FINNEGAN MICHAEL G.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF LIMITED SETTLEMENT WITH CERTAIN DEFENDANTS

2/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF LIMITED SETTLEMENT WITH CERTAIN DEFENDANTS

Case Management Statement

2/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

2/24/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: APPEAL)

2/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: APPEAL)

Request for Dismissal

3/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

2/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Appeal - Remittitur - Other - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - OTHER - AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED AND REMANDED IN PART WITH DIRECTIONS. B297322. "(R)"

2/3/2021: Appeal - Remittitur - Other - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - OTHER - AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED AND REMANDED IN PART WITH DIRECTIONS. B297322. "(R)"

Case Management Statement

2/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

2/10/2021: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Case Management Statement

2/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

12/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

12/24/2020: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Notice - NOTICE OF STAY IN LIEU OF CMS

12/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF STAY IN LIEU OF CMS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: APPEAL)

1/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: APPEAL)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/17/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

171 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Thomas Emens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Status Conference (reappeal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Thomas Emens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference re: appeal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Thomas Emens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Diocese Of Orange (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Limited Settlement with Certain Defendants); Filed by Thomas Emens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Diocese Of Fresno (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by Thomas Emens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
199 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Docketat 4:13 PM in Department 74; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/16/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Thomas Emens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Thomas Emens (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIOCESE OF SAN BERNARDINO is a litigant

Latest cases where DIOCESE OF OAKLAND is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SAN is a litigant