This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 16:40:01 (UTC).

THOMAS CUNNINGHAM, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ANTHONY DIK, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 THOMAS CUNNINGHAM, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANTHONY DIK, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3277

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUNNINGHAM AN INDIVIDUAL THOMAS

Defendant

DIK AN INDIVIDUAL ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

RUBIN JAY T.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/31/2019: Request for Dismissal

Answer

5/15/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/15/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

4/24/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for

4/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Redemption/Remittance Notice

4/18/2019: Redemption/Remittance Notice

Summons

4/17/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/17/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/17/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by THOMAS CUNNINGHAM, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Answer; Filed by ANTHONY DIK, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by ANTHONY DIK, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by THOMAS CUNNINGHAM, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • PI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by THOMAS CUNNINGHAM, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by THOMAS CUNNINGHAM, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by THOMAS CUNNINGHAM, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.