This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2023 at 20:20:59 (UTC).

THIRD EYE BLIND INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ARION SALAZAR, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 THIRD EYE BLIND INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARION SALAZAR, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0549

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

THIRD EYE BLIND INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JENKINS STEPHAN

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

SALAZAR ARION AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDEL ORY

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SINGLETON JOSEPH W.

Cross Defendant Attorney

IDELL RICHARD J

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/31/2022: Request for Dismissal

Summons Summons on Complaint

10/22/2020: Summons Summons on Complaint

Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Stipulation Re: Jurisdiction; [Proposed] Order

1/24/2022: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Stipulation Re: Jurisdiction; [Proposed] Order

Response (name extension) Response TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

1/25/2022: Response (name extension) Response TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Notice (name extension) Notice OF ENTRY OF ORDER

1/25/2022: Notice (name extension) Notice OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Case Management Statement

11/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference / Status of Settlement)

12/3/2021: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference / Status of Settlement)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference / Status of Settlement) of 12/03/2021

12/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference / Status of Settlement) of 12/03/2021

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference / Status of Settlement)

10/22/2021: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference / Status of Settlement)

Case Management Statement

10/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

8/23/2021: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

8/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

5/24/2021: Answer

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

5/25/2021: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Statement of the Case

5/17/2021: Statement of the Case

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Stipulation re: Extension of Time to Respond to Cross-Complaint; [Proposed] Order

4/23/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Stipulation re: Extension of Time to Respond to Cross-Complaint; [Proposed] Order

Answer

3/24/2021: Answer

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/01/2022

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Third Eye Blind Inc a California Corporation on 10/22/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Third Eye Blind Inc a California Corporation as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022

DocketResponse TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; Filed by: Third Eye Blind Inc a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022

DocketNotice OF ENTRY OF ORDER; Filed by: Third Eye Blind Inc a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2022

DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation Re: Jurisdiction; [Proposed] Order; Signed and Filed by: Third Eye Blind Inc a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2022

DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation Re: Jurisdiction; [Proposed] Order: Filed By: Third Eye Blind Inc a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 01/24/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/24/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2022

DocketUpdated -- Stipulation Re: Jurisdiction; Order: Status Date changed from 01/24/2022 to 01/24/2022; Exact Name: Stipulation Re: Jurisdiction; Order; Result Date changed from 01/24/2022 to 01/24/2022; As To Parties: removed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2021

DocketUpdated -- Joint Case Management Statement: Exact Name: Joint Case Management Statement; As To Parties: removed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2021

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2021

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference / Status of Settlement)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
85 More Docket Entries
10/22/2020

DocketUpdated -- Document Transmittal: Status Date changed from 10/23/2020 to 10/22/2020; As To Parties: removed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2020

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2020

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2020

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2019

DocketUpdated -- Complaint: Status Date changed from 10/22/2020 to 09/19/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2019

DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: Status Date changed from 10/22/2020 to 09/19/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2019

DocketUpdated -- Transfer In Case Documents Register of Actions: Status Date changed from 10/22/2020 to 09/19/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2019

DocketUpdated -- Complaint: Status Date changed from 10/22/2020 to 09/19/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2019

DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: Status Date changed from 10/22/2020 to 09/19/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2019

DocketUpdated -- Transfer In Case Documents Register of Actions: Status Date changed from 10/22/2020 to 09/19/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0549    Hearing Date: March 04, 2021    Dept: P


Case Number: SC128704    Hearing Date: March 04, 2021    Dept: P

Tentative Ruling

American Express Bank, FSB v. Morrison et al., Case No. SC128704

Hearing Date March 4, 2021

Plaintiff’s Motion for Order Vacating Dismissal and Entering Judgment – UNOPPOSED

Plaintiff and defendant entered a settlement agreement, under which defendant agreed to pay $45,267.03 via monthly payments. Defendant made payments totaling $34,969.00 before defaulting. Penuela decl. ¶¶7-9. Plaintiff moves for entry of judgment.

Under Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. ;664.6, parties settling a case may stipulate for a court to retain jurisdiction retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement and enter judgment pursuant to its terms. The settlement agreement contains a ;664.6 stipulation and is signed by both parties. Plaintiff’s exhibit A, pgs. 3, 6. Plaintiff’s declaration states defendant defaulted on his obligations. Defendant has not opposed. Entry of judgment for the remaining settlement balance is proper. GRANTED. Judgment to be entered for $9,618.03 in principal and $710.00 in costs, totaling $10,328.03.

DUE TO THE ONGOING COVID-19 PANDEMIC PARTIES AND COUNSEL ARE ENCOURAGED TO APPEAR VIA LA COURT CONNECT.