This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/05/2020 at 03:09:14 (UTC).

THERESA DE LOS SANTOS VS SCOTT PROPERTIES ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 THERESA DE LOS SANTOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SCOTT PROPERTIES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI and HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9661

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LOS SANTOS THERESA

Defendants

D.S.L. CONSTRUCTION CORP

SCOTT PROPERTIES INC

PROPETIES SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOMALONT RONALD JAY ESQ.

WORKMAN SETH ELIJAH

HINMAN JOHN S

Defendant Attorney

MOROVATI CHRISTINA YOUNG ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLE...) OF 01/28/2020

1/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLE...) OF 01/28/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLE...)

1/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLE...)

Notice of Settlement

1/28/2020: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/27/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER TO MINUTE ORDER OF 12/10/19 TO ADD MOVING...)

12/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER TO MINUTE ORDER OF 12/10/19 TO ADD MOVING...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA)

12/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (ERMELINDA HERNANDEZ #12257)

12/10/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (ERMELINDA HERNANDEZ #12257)

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR ORDER FOR NONPARTY, CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR UCLA MEDICAL CENTER, TO COMPLY WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS R

12/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR ORDER FOR NONPARTY, CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR UCLA MEDICAL CENTER, TO COMPLY WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS R

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE TO FEBRUARY 2020 AND CONTINUE THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

11/13/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE TO FEBRUARY 2020 AND CONTINUE THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE TO FEBRUARY 2020 AND CONTINUE THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

11/13/2019: Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE TO FEBRUARY 2020 AND CONTINUE THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ...)

11/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ...)

Separate Statement

11/14/2019: Separate Statement

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER FOR NONPARTY, CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR UCLA MEDICAL CENTER, TO COMPLY WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECO

11/14/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER FOR NONPARTY, CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR UCLA MEDICAL CENTER, TO COMPLY WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECO

Opposition - OPPOSITION MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING DEFENDANT FROM IDENTIFYIN, RECITING, REFERENCING, OR ADMINTTING HEARSAY OR EVIDENCE BASED ON HEARSAY THAT IS CONTAINED IN REPORTS

11/4/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING DEFENDANT FROM IDENTIFYIN, RECITING, REFERENCING, OR ADMINTTING HEARSAY OR EVIDENCE BASED ON HEARSAY THAT IS CONTAINED IN REPORTS

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING EVIDENCE THAT PLAINTIFF REMAINED LIVING IN THE PROPERTY WERE THE FALL OCCURRED

11/6/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING EVIDENCE THAT PLAINTIFF REMAINED LIVING IN THE PROPERTY WERE THE FALL OCCURRED

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OF ANY BACK ISSUES OR PLAINTIFF'S BLADDER SURGERY AS THERE IS NO MEDICAL CAUSATION AND ANY SUCH EVIDENCE WOULD LACK

11/6/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE OF ANY BACK ISSUES OR PLAINTIFF'S BLADDER SURGERY AS THERE IS NO MEDICAL CAUSATION AND ANY SUCH EVIDENCE WOULD LACK

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT, D.S.L. CONSTRUCTION CORP.'S, REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PROHIBIT COUNSEL FROM PRECONDITIONING THE JURORS DURING VOIR DIRE ON DAMAGES

11/6/2019: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT, D.S.L. CONSTRUCTION CORP.'S, REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PROHIBIT COUNSEL FROM PRECONDITIONING THE JURORS DURING VOIR DIRE ON DAMAGES

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Theresa De Los Santos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Unconditional Settle...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Notice of Unconditional Settle...) of 01/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Theresa De Los Santos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by D.S.L. Construction Corp (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docketat 3:15 PM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Compliance with Deposition Subpoena) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order to Minute Order of 12/10/19 to Add Moving...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Ermelinda Hernandez #12257)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by D.S.L. Construction Corp (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) (($20.00 fee paid10/01/2018-CCH499422030)); Filed by D.S.L. Construction Corp (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by D.S.L. Construction Corp (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Theresa De Los Santos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9661    Hearing Date: December 10, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

THERESA DE LOS SANTOS,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

SCOTT PROPERTIES, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: ****9661

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION; IMPOSING SANCTIONS

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

December 10, 2019

Plaintiff, Theresa De Los Santos filed this action against Defendants, Scot Properties, Scott Properties, Inc., and D.S.L. Construction Corp. for damages arising out of a trip and fall. Plaintiff identified UCLA Medical Center as her primary care physician’s office. Defendant therefore issued a deposition subpoena for personal appearance and production of documents on UCLA. UCLA asked if it could produce all of Plaintiff’s medical records in lieu of appearing for deposition, and Defendant agreed; however, despite numerous attempts to follow up, UCLA has not produced the records or appeared for deposition. At this time, Defendant moves to compel the custodian of records for UCLA to appear for deposition and produce documents at deposition; in the alternative, Defendant asks that UCLA be required to produce Plaintiff’s medical chart.

The Court notes that the subpoena was personally served on UCLA, and that both Plaintiff and UCLA were properly served with notice of this motion (Plaintiff was served by mail and UCLA by personal service). The time for opposition has lapsed per CCP ;1005(b), and there is no opposition to the motion. The motion to compel compliance with the subpoena is therefore granted. CCP ;1987.1. UCLA is ordered to appear for deposition at a date, time, and location to be noticed by Defendant. If UCLA wishes to avoid appearance, UCLA must produce Plaintiff’s chart at least ten days prior to the scheduled deposition.

Defendant seeks sanctions per CCP ;1987.2, which provides:

Except as specified in subdivision (c), in making an order pursuant to motion made under subdivision (c) of Section 1987 or under Section 1987.1, the court may in its discretion award the amount of the reasonable expenses incurred in making or opposing the motion, including reasonable attorney's fees, if the court finds the motion was made or opposed in bad faith or without substantial justification or that one or more of the requirements of the subpoena was oppressive.

CRC 3.1348(a) makes clear that discovery sanctions are appropriate even if no opposition to the motion is filed; thus, the language concerning opposing in bad faith or without substantial justification should be read to include failing entirely to file opposition. Defense Counsel reasonably supports all of the fees sought in connection with the motion, with the exception of the time to review an opposition and prepare a reply. The Court therefore reduces the sanctions sought from $2310 to $1860.

UCLA Medical Center is ordered to pay sanctions to Defendant, by and through its attorney of record, in the total amount of $1860, within twenty days.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D.S.L. CONSTRUCTION CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where SCOTTO PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOROVATI CHRISTINA Y. ESQUIRE