This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 11:24:48 (UTC).

THEODORE SANDOVAL VS PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM ? SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 THEODORE SANDOVAL filed an Other lawsuit against PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT and MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4080

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANDOVAL THEODORE

Respondents

BORAZIANI BORIS MD

PARKWEST REHABILITATION CENTER LLC DBA PARKWEST HEALTHCARE CENTER

PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES

PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM ? SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DBA PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER

SOLORZANO CRYSTAL

VALLE EVAN J. MD

PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM ? SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DBA PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS SUB-ACUTE AND PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MED CENTER D/P SNF

PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MED CENTER D/P SNF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KANG GORDON SUSAN Y.

Respondent Attorney

FRASER STEPHEN C.

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/3/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/3/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Continuance

3/2/2023: Notice of Continuance

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT PARKWEST REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DBA PARKWEST HEALTHCARE CENTERS NOTICE OF RESETTING ITS PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY THE SUPERIOR COURT MATTER PEND

3/1/2023: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT PARKWEST REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DBA PARKWEST HEALTHCARE CENTERS NOTICE OF RESETTING ITS PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY THE SUPERIOR COURT MATTER PEND

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

2/14/2023: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Opposition - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PARKWEST REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DBA PARKWEST HEALTHCARE CENTERS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF SUSAN KANG GORDON, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THE

2/10/2023: Opposition - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PARKWEST REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, DBA PARKWEST HEALTHCARE CENTERS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF SUSAN KANG GORDON, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRANSFERRING CASE TO NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT PUR...) OF 02/07/2023

2/7/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRANSFERRING CASE TO NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT PUR...) OF 02/07/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TRANSFERRING CASE TO NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT PUR...)

2/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TRANSFERRING CASE TO NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT PUR...)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

2/6/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

2/3/2023: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL K. DIK IN COMPLIANCE WITH CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41 435.5 IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

2/3/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL K. DIK IN COMPLIANCE WITH CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41 435.5 IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Request for Judicial Notice

2/3/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Order - ORDER ON STIPULATION TRANSFERRING CASE FROM CENTRAL DISTRICT TO NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT CHATSWORTH

2/1/2023: Order - ORDER ON STIPULATION TRANSFERRING CASE FROM CENTRAL DISTRICT TO NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT CHATSWORTH

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO TRANSFER CASE FOR ALL PURPOSES FROM THE CENTRAL DISTRICT TO THE NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT CHATSWORTH COURTHOUSE

1/24/2023: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO TRANSFER CASE FOR ALL PURPOSES FROM THE CENTRAL DISTRICT TO THE NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT CHATSWORTH COURTHOUSE

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • Hearing06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • Hearing06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Hearing04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/01/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) OF DEFENDANT PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM scheduled for 06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketNotice DEFENDANT PARKWEST REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, dba PARKWEST HEALTHCARE CENTERS NOTICE OF RESETTING ITS PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY THE SUPERIOR COURT MATTER PENDING THE HEARING ON THE PETITION; Filed by: PARKWEST REHABILITATION CENTER LLC (Respondent); As to: THEODORE SANDOVAL (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: THEODORE SANDOVAL (Petitioner); As to: CRYSTAL SOLORZANO (Respondent); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/03/2023; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketAddress for Susan Y. Kang Gordon (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- PARKWEST REHABILITATION CENTER (Respondent): Organization Name changed from PARKWEST REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC, Individually to PARKWEST REHABILITATION CENTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Holly J. Fujie in Department 56 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint for Damages; Filed by: THEODORE SANDOVAL (Petitioner); As to: PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Respondent); BORIS BORAZIANI, MD (Respondent); EVAN J. VALLE, MD (Respondent) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THEODORE SANDOVAL (Petitioner); As to: PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA (Respondent); BORIS BORAZIANI, MD (Respondent); EVAN J. VALLE, MD (Respondent) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less