This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 03:51:57 (UTC).

THEODORE ROBERT LOSEE VS SILVESTRE HILARIO

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by THEODORE ROBERT LOSEE against SILVESTRE HILARIO in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1868

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LOSEE THEODORE ROBERT

Respondents and Defendants

HILARIO SILVESTRE

DOES 1 TO 50

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/6/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

11/15/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/6/2018: Answer

Unknown

1/10/2019: Unknown

Stipulation and Order

3/19/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice

6/17/2019: Notice

SUMMONS

1/26/2018: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY

1/26/2018: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Change of Email Address); Filed by Silvestre Hilario (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial, FSC [And Related Motion/Discovery Dates]); Filed by Theodore Robert Losee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Silvestre Hilario (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Silvestre Hilario (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Theodore Robert Losee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Theodore Robert Losee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Theodore Robert Losee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691868    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 5

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

theodore robert losee,

Plaintiff,

v.

silvestre hilario,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC691868

Hearing Date: December 16, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Defendant’s MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Plaintiff Theodore Robert Losee (“Plaintiff”) sued Defendant Silvestre Hilario (“Defendant”) based on injuries he sustained in a motor vehicle collision. Defendant moves to continue the trial date, currently set for January 17, 2020, to May 1, 2020 because Defendant’s retained expert is unavailable to testify at trial given the current trial date, and the parties have not yet completed discovery. Per California Rules of Court, rule 3.1332, a trial continuance may be appropriate due to “[t]he unavailability of an essential lay or expert witness . . . .” (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1332, subdivision (c)(1).) Accordingly, Defendant has set forth “an affirmative showing of good cause” that supports the requested continuance. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1332 (c).) Plaintiff stipulates to the continuance. Therefore, the motion is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The final status conference and trial dates are advanced and vacated. The Court sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: April 17, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: May 1, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off are based on the new trial date. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 16, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court