This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 11:48:09 (UTC).

THEODORE LLOYD STAUF VS ALMA LORENA STAUF

Case Summary

On 10/02/2017 THEODORE LLOYD STAUF filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALMA LORENA STAUF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7428

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STAUF THEODORE LLOYD

Defendants

STAUF ALMA LORENA

STAUF ALMA LORENA AKA ALMA HANSEN

STAUF ALMA LORENA AKA HANSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARD THOMAS J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DERRYBERRY R. STEVEN

 

Court Documents

BREACH OF IMPLIED CONTRACT (UNJUST ENRICHMENT) DECLARATORY RELIEF AND COMMON COUNTS

12/13/2017: BREACH OF IMPLIED CONTRACT (UNJUST ENRICHMENT) DECLARATORY RELIEF AND COMMON COUNTS

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

1/16/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Unknown

1/25/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/25/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/30/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

1/31/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

8/2/2018: Request for Dismissal

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/22/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Service

11/22/2017: Proof of Service

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

11/22/2017: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

10/2/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/2/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

10/2/2017: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

10/2/2017: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

SUMMONS

10/2/2017: SUMMONS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by THEODORE LLOYD STAUF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by THEODORE LLOYD STAUF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by ALMA LORENA AKA HANSEN STAUF (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by THEODORE LLOYD STAUF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.