This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2022 at 12:48:16 (UTC).

THEODORE BOUB VS PRIME HEALTHCARE, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 THEODORE BOUB filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PRIME HEALTHCARE, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4375

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOUB THEODORE

Defendant

PRIME HEALTHCARE DBA ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUCHSBAUM BRENT S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

12/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/6/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/21/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

3/21/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • Hearing05/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Theodore Boub (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Theodore Boub (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Theodore Boub (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Theodore Boub (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Theodore Boub (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Theodore Boub (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCHSBAUM BRENT STUART