This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 04:36:41 (UTC).

THEOCHARIS ROUSSOS, ET AL. VS MAXWELL STONE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 THEOCHARIS ROUSSOS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MAXWELL STONE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1366

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

O.F.ENTERPRISES LLC

ROUSSOS THEOCHARIS

ROUSSOS THEODOSIOS

Defendants

FINE SCOT

GOLDMAN RICHARD

ITSKOWITCH STANLEY

MANDALAY INCOME FUND L LP

MARQUEE FUNDING GROUP INC.

NG CHUCK

ROBERTS KEVIN

STONE MAXWELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEITELBAUM MELVIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/13/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION

8/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION

Request for Dismissal

10/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Theocharis roussos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Theocharis roussos (Plaintiff); theodosios roussos (Plaintiff); O.F.ENTERPRISES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Theocharis roussos (Plaintiff); theodosios roussos (Plaintiff); O.F.ENTERPRISES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Theocharis roussos (Plaintiff); theodosios roussos (Plaintiff); O.F.ENTERPRISES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum and Statement of Location); Filed by Theocharis roussos (Plaintiff); theodosios roussos (Plaintiff); O.F.ENTERPRISES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Enterprise, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MARQUEE FUNDING GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TEITELBAUM MELVIN