This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 09:33:27 (UTC).

THELMA ROTONDE VS U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 THELMA ROTONDE filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1970

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROTONDE THELMA

Defendants

U.S. BANCORP DBA U.S. BANK A DELAWARE CORPORATION

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALKANA ROBERT I.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2023
  • Hearing07/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Thelma Rotonde (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. Bank National Association (Defendant); U.S. Bancorp (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Thelma Rotonde (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. Bank National Association (Defendant); Service Date: 02/08/2023; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Thelma Rotonde (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. Bancorp (Defendant); Service Date: 02/08/2023; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lia Martin in Department 16 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Thelma Rotonde (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. Bank National Association (Defendant); U.S. Bancorp (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Thelma Rotonde (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. Bank National Association (Defendant); U.S. Bancorp (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Thelma Rotonde (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. Bank National Association (Defendant); U.S. Bancorp (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less