This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 07:59:16 (UTC).

THELIDRIA CALHOUN, IN AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST DIMITRIA CALHOUN VS TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 THELIDRIA CALHOUN, IN AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST DIMITRIA CALHOUN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0321

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALHOUN IN AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST DIMITRIA CALHOUN THELIDRIA

Defendants

KINDRED HOSPITAL SOUTHBAY

TRANSITIONAL CARE UNIT

MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA

TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PITTMAN ALVIN L.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

6/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/28/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2024
  • Hearing05/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Thelidria Calhoun, in and through her Successor-in-Interest Dimitria Calhoun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Thelidria Calhoun, in and through her Successor-in-Interest Dimitria Calhoun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED HOSPITAL SOUTH BAY is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. DBA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRANCE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PITTMAN ALVIN LEONARD