This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 00:01:01 (UTC).

THEISEN, ANDREA VS CUSTODIA, BRETT

Case Summary

On 01/20/2017 THEISEN, ANDREA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CUSTODIA, BRETT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4328

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THEISEN ANDREA

Respondent

CUSTODIA BRETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Declaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Sub. F46 - WFS ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (reject ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (entered ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (rejected ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons (re: fl100, summons flamily law cover sheet ack. of receipt ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F39, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Held - FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Theisen, Andrea ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Theisen, Andrea ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less