This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 17:47:15 (UTC).

THEA MANN FARBERMAN VS TIM HAYNIE CUSTOM, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 THEA MANN FARBERMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TIM HAYNIE CUSTOM, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9869

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARBERMAN THEA MANN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GUERNSEY SARA E.

PARAGON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

TIM HAYNIE CUSTOM INC.

DE VOLTAIRE HOMEOWNERS? ASSOCIATION INC.

NV CONSTRUCTION INC.

NEO BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KENWORTHY AGUSTOS

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

PARAGON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

TIM HAYNIE CUSTOM INC.

DE VOLTAIRE HOMEOWNERS? ASSOCIATION INC.

NV CONSTRUCTION INC.

NEO BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KENWORTHY AGUSTOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POCRASS JAMES L.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SAHELIAN ARA

TERCERO NAPOLEON G.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

8/13/2021: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail

6/28/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Cross-Complaint

6/28/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

6/28/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/28/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

8/13/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

8/13/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

5/27/2021: Cross-Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

5/27/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/27/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

4/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/18/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/18/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2024
  • Hearing03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Hearing08/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by DE VOLTAIRE HOMEOWNERS? ASSOCIATION, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DE VOLTAIRE HOMEOWNERS? ASSOCIATION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by DE VOLTAIRE HOMEOWNERS? ASSOCIATION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by DE VOLTAIRE HOMEOWNERS? ASSOCIATION, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by THEA MANN FARBERMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TIM HAYNIE CUSTOM, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by TIM HAYNIE CUSTOM, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by THEA MANN FARBERMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by THEA MANN FARBERMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by THEA MANN FARBERMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by THEA MANN FARBERMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by THEA MANN FARBERMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by THEA MANN FARBERMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by THEA MANN FARBERMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARAGON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NV CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAHELIAN ARA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TERCERO NAPOLEON G