Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 13:51:01 (UTC).

THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION VS ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT:

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 THE WOLF FIRM, A LAW CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0201

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE WOLF FIRM A LAW CORPORATION

Respondent

ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER TRUSTEE'S SALE OF REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT:

Interested Parties

GARCIA MICHAEL Q.

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TOMPKINS KAYO MANSON

Respondent and Interested Party Attorney

PODMENIK MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PETITION OF TRUSTEE, THE WOLF FIRM, TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 2924J(C) & (D)

7/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PETITION OF TRUSTEE, THE WOLF FIRM, TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 2924J(C) & (D)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER;) OF 03/08/2021, COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING

3/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER;) OF 03/08/2021, COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING

Order - ORDER ON THE COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING

3/8/2021: Order - ORDER ON THE COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING

Response - RESPONSE RESPONSE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF BANK OF AMERICA'S CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS

2/2/2021: Response - RESPONSE RESPONSE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF BANK OF AMERICA'S CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS

Reply - REPLY OF CLAIMANT ELIZABETH K. BEAVER REVOCABLE TRUST TO THE RESPONSE OF CLAIMANT BANK OF AMERICA IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS

2/9/2021: Reply - REPLY OF CLAIMANT ELIZABETH K. BEAVER REVOCABLE TRUST TO THE RESPONSE OF CLAIMANT BANK OF AMERICA IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL RE: CMC AND SURPLUS FUNDS

11/2/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL RE: CMC AND SURPLUS FUNDS

Case Management Statement

11/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CLAIM TO SURPLUS FUNDS DEPOSITED

11/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CLAIM TO SURPLUS FUNDS DEPOSITED

Notice of Limited Scope Representation

11/17/2020: Notice of Limited Scope Representation

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DETERMINATION OF DISTRIBUTION OF SURPLU...)

11/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DETERMINATION OF DISTRIBUTION OF SURPLU...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER DEPOSITING SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE PEN...)

9/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER DEPOSITING SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE PEN...)

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE: PETITION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

9/18/2020: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER RE: PETITION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: PETITION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

9/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: PETITION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

Response to Petition

9/9/2020: Response to Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/29/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

7/29/2020: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOrder (Proposed Order to Disburse Surplus Funds); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Real Party in Interest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter;) of 03/08/2021, Court's Tentative Ruling); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketOrder (on the Court's Tentative Ruling); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Status Conference (ReDetermination of Distribution of Surplus Funds) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Determination of Distribution of Surplu...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketReply (Of Claimant Elizabeth K. Beaver Revocable Trust to the Response of Claimant Bank of America In Support of Claim For Surplus Funds); Filed by Michael Q. Garcia (Real Party in Interest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketResponse (Response Brief in Support of Bank of America's Claim for Surplus Funds); Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Real Party in Interest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketBrief (OF CLAIMANT AND RESPONDENT MICHAEL Q. GARCIA SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE ELIZABETH K. BEAVBER REVOCABLE TRUST IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM FOR SURPLUS FUNDS PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 2924j (c) and (d) DECLARATION OF MICHAEL Q. GARCIA); Filed by Michael Q. Garcia (Real Party in Interest)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketResponse to Petition; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Real Party in Interest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Real Party in Interest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by The Wolf Firm, a Law corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by The Wolf Firm, a Law corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The Wolf Firm, a Law corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Petition of Trustee, the Wolf Firm, to Deposit Surplus Funds Pursuant to Civil Code Section 2924j(c) & (d)); Filed by The Wolf Firm, a Law corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketOrder (Proposed Order re: Petition to Deposit Surplus Funds); Filed by The Wolf Firm, a Law corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WOLF FIRM is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Podmenik, Matthew