This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2023 at 05:20:33 (UTC).

THE WILLIAM A. SULLIVAN TRUST

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 THE WILLIAM A SULLIVAN TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WADA, ROBERT S and PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1376

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WADA, ROBERT S

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNSON NICK

Not Classified By Court

THE WILLIAM A. SULLIVAN TRUST

Other

ST. JUDE CHILDREN'S RESEARCH HOSPITAL

Trustee

DUMAS DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SOROY H. MICHAEL

Not Classified By Court and Trustee Attorney

BOWNE ROBERT RALPH II

Other Attorney

COOPER TARA LYNN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/27/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/27/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/27/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/27/2023: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/29/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/7/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/7/2022: Minute Order

Supplement - SUPPLEMENT TO OBJECTIONS TO PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEE TO PERFORM DUTIES; ENJOIN THE TRUSTEE FROM CO

10/5/2022: Supplement - SUPPLEMENT TO OBJECTIONS TO PETITION TO COMPEL TRUSTEE TO PERFORM DUTIES; ENJOIN THE TRUSTEE FROM CO

Supplement - Supplement

10/5/2022: Supplement - Supplement

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037) - Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

10/5/2022: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037) - Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037) - Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

10/5/2022: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037) - Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Supplement - Supplement

10/5/2022: Supplement - Supplement

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - TRUSTEE'S PETITION TO AUTHORIZE AND INSTRUCT THE SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

9/19/2022: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - TRUSTEE'S PETITION TO AUTHORIZE AND INSTRUCT THE SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

Minute Order

9/16/2022: Minute Order

Objection - Trust Petition - to Petition to Authorize and Instruct the Sale

9/8/2022: Objection - Trust Petition - to Petition to Authorize and Instruct the Sale

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037) - Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

7/11/2022: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037) - Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Petition to authorize and instruct the sale

7/6/2022: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Petition to authorize and instruct the sale

Objection - Trust Petition - Objection - Trust Petition

7/6/2022: Objection - Trust Petition - Objection - Trust Petition

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2023
  • Hearing08/17/2023 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 4 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • Hearing08/17/2023 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 4 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trustee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trustee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Beneficiary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Wada, Robert S, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Beneficiary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice (Request for Special Notice ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition To: (1) Compel Successor Trustee Daniel Dumas To Perform The Trustee's Duties; ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less