This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 00:39:01 (UTC).

THE WIBROE TRUST DTD MARCH 21,1990

Case Summary

On 04/16/2018 THE WIBROE TRUST DTD MARCH 21,1990 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WADA, ROBERT S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3577

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WADA, ROBERT S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WIBROE LARS

Not Classified By Court

THE WIBROE TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MORONEY E THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - PETITION TO INVALIDATE NOVEMBER 27, 2017 TRUST AMENDMENT; FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY BY TRUSTEE; AND FOR REMOVAL TRUSTEE

4/16/2018: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - PETITION TO INVALIDATE NOVEMBER 27, 2017 TRUST AMENDMENT; FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY BY TRUSTEE; AND FOR REMOVAL TRUSTEE

Summons

5/30/2018: Summons

Notice - Related Cases - - 17STPB06297

6/5/2018: Notice - Related Cases - - 17STPB06297

Notice - Hearing

6/5/2018: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Hearing - Re: Petition to Invalidate Trust on 6/26/18

6/5/2018: Notice - Hearing - Re: Petition to Invalidate Trust on 6/26/18

Notice - Of Recording Notice of Pendency of Action

6/5/2018: Notice - Of Recording Notice of Pendency of Action

Proof of Service - Proof of Service Summons

6/11/2018: Proof of Service - Proof of Service Summons

Proof of Service

6/11/2018: Proof of Service

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

6/12/2018: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Supplement - Supplement

6/20/2018: Supplement - Supplement

Minute Order

6/26/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/31/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/22/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/22/2019: Minute Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • in Probate Department 99, Wada, Robert S, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Petition Denied (Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) filed on April 16, 2018 by Lars Wibroe. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • in Probate Department 99, Wada, Robert S, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • in Probate Department 99, Wada, Robert S, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • in Probate Department 99, Wada, Robert S, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service Summons ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Notice - Related Cases (- 17STPB06297 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Notice - Hearing (Re: Petition to Invalidate Trust on 6/26/18 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Notice (Of Recording Notice of Pendency of Action ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (PROBATE CASE COVER SHEET AND CERTIFICATE OF GROUNDS FOR ASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (PETITION TO INVALIDATE NOVEMBER 27, 2017 TRUST AMENDMENT; FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY BY TRUSTEE; AND FOR REMOVAL TRUSTEE ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORONEY E. THOMAS LAW OFFICES OF