Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 00:39:25 (UTC).

THE WALT AND SUE BRIGGS LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 THE WALT AND SUE BRIGGS LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PENNY, BRENDA, CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L., WADA, ROBERT S and PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9424

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PENNY, BRENDA

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

WADA, ROBERT S

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SWEENIE BRIDGET L.

BRIGGS MICHAEL S.

Not Classified By Court

THE WALT AND SUE BRIGGS LIVING TRUST

Trustees

BRIGGS SUE ANN - Co

CARCHIDI JEFF GEORGE - Attorney for Petitioner for Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CUMMING WILLIAM REID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • Proof of Service (Proof of Service of Trial Brief of Sue Ann Briggs ); Filed by Co - Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Exhibit List (Joint Exhibit List ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • in Probate Department 99, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Brief (Trial Brief of Sue Ann Briggs ); Filed by Co - Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Ex Parte - Order (Trial Date is Continued to 6/19/2019 @ 8:30 am ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Declaration (Ex Parte Declaration of Sue Ann Briggs ); Filed by Co - Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Ex Parte - Application (Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Opposition (Ex Parte Opposition of Sue Ann Briggs ); Filed by Co - Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Declaration (Ex Parte Declaration of Jeff Carchidi ); Filed by Co - Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Notice (Verification to Opposition of Sue Ann Briggs to Petition for (1) Order Invalidating ); Filed by Co - Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Notice (Notice of Ruling Regarding Status Conference ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • in Probate Department 99, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Objection - Trust Petition (Oppostionn of Sue Ann Briggs to Peitition ); Filed by Co - Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition - Trust (Initial) ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUMMING, WILLIAM R