This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2020 at 05:20:42 (UTC).

THE VILLAGES AT SANTA FE SPRINGS HOMEOWNERS ASSSOCIATIONA VS

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 THE VILLAGES AT SANTA FE SPRINGS HOMEOWNERS ASSSOCIATIONA VS was filed as a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL, ELIHU M. BERLE and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4472

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

ELIHU M. BERLE

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JASMINE AT THE VILLAGES AT SANTA FE SPRIN

CAMELLIA AT THE VILAGES AT SANTA FE SPRIN

THE VILLAGES AT SANTA FE SPRINGS HOMEOWNE

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

COMSTOCK HOMES BROKER INC.

VILLAGES AT HERITAGE SPRINGS LLC

RCS-VILLAGES DEVELOPMENT LLC

DOES 1 TO 1000

COMSTOCK CROSSNER & ASSOCIATES DEVELOPMEN

DOES 1 TO 1000 INCLUSIVE

COMSTOCK HOMES BROKER INC

TEST AMERICAN DRILLING DOE 219

THE MASONRY GROUP DOE 220

TRUE AIR MECHANICAL DOE 222

WEST COAST CONCRETE DOE 223

ALLENCO DOE 202

MERIT FRAMING DOE 212

RAYCON ENVIRONMENTAL INC. DOE 216

SELECT PLASTERING DOE 217

MARK COMPANY DOE 210

D&D PAINTING DOE 205

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JACKSON LEE ESQ.

STAFFELDT JONATHAN PAUL

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ZUCKER II LAWRENCE S. ESQ.

ZUCKER LAWRENCE SI II

OBRA-WHITE BETHSAIDA CORREA

D'ANDREA MICHAEL A JR

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ZUCKER LAWRENCE SI II

OBRA-WHITE BETHSAIDA CORREA

 

Court Documents

Order - -INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

4/3/2018: Order - -INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL AND CANCELLATION OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

9/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL AND CANCELLATION OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING

Joint Status Conference Report

9/9/2019: Joint Status Conference Report

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BAD ADDRESS

3/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BAD ADDRESS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BAD ADDRESS (CLARY ROOFING)

3/20/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BAD ADDRESS (CLARY ROOFING)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BAD ADDRESS (TEST AMERICAN DRILLING)

3/20/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BAD ADDRESS (TEST AMERICAN DRILLING)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/20/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/20/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

3/8/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Other - - Order re second joint stipulation to extend time to add additional parties to plaintiffs' complaint and defendants' cross-complaint

2/26/2019: Other - - Order re second joint stipulation to extend time to add additional parties to plaintiffs' complaint and defendants' cross-complaint

Stipulation and Order - Second Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Add Additional Parties to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Defendants' Cross-Complaint

2/1/2019: Stipulation and Order - Second Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Add Additional Parties to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Defendants' Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/24/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/16/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Status Report - Status Report re Additional Defendants and Cross-Defendants - Joint

11/30/2018: Status Report - Status Report re Additional Defendants and Cross-Defendants - Joint

Notice - NOTICE OF RULINGS AT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

6/5/2018: Notice - NOTICE OF RULINGS AT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

6/1/2018: Minute Order -

Civil Deposit -

5/25/2018: Civil Deposit -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

5/10/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE Order to Show Cause RE: Dismissal (Settlement)); Filed by Raycon Environmental, Inc. (Doe 216) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice); Filed by Camellia at The Villages at Santa Fe Springs Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); Jasmine at The Villages at Santa Fe Springs Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); The Villages at Santa Fe Springs Homeowners Association (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Docketat 11:52 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Vacating 09/17/19 Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNotice (of OSC RE Dismissal and Cancellation of Status Conference Hearing); Filed by Comstock Crossner & Associates Development Company, Inc. (Defendant); RCS-Villages Development, LLC (Defendant); Villages at Heritage Springs LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Report; Filed by The Villages at Santa Fe Springs Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); The Villages HOA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-04-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketOrder -INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Camellia at The Villages at Santa Fe Springs Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); Jasmine at The Villages at Santa Fe Springs Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); The Villages at Santa Fe Springs Homeowners Association (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 309; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. VIOLATION OF BUILDING STANDARDS AS SET FORTH IN CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 896 ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Camellia at The Villages at Santa Fe Springs Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); Jasmine at The Villages at Santa Fe Springs Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); The Villages at Santa Fe Springs Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

FILED

MILSTEIN JACKSON Superior Court of Califomnia FAIRCHILD & WADE, LLP ountv of L.ns Anagles 10250 Constellation Blvd., 14" Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067 | FEB 20 2018 Telephone: (310) 396-9600 Sh

ermiR. ¢ : . Fax: (310) 396-9635 By Sutive Officen/Clerk. Lee Jackson, Esq., State Bar No.:216970 SEdim o Deputy

ljackson@m jfwlaw.com Jonathan Staffeldt, Esq., State Bar No.:252326 jstaffeldt@mjfwlaw.com

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

The Villages at Santa Fe Springs Homeowners Association

Jasmine at The Villages at Santa Fe Springs Homeowners Association Camellia at The Villages at Santa Fe Springs Homeowners Association

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

case No.: BO 6 9447 2

THE VILLAGES AT SANTA FE SPRINGS

HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, a California Corporation; JASMINE AT THE VILLAGES

AT SANTA FE SPRINGS HOMEOWNERS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: ASSOCIATION, a California Corporation; CAMELLIA AT THE VILLAGES AT SANTA 1. VIOLATION OF BUILDING

STANDARDS AS SET FORTH IN CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE §896 BREACH OF CONTRACT BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY FE SPRINGS HOMEOWNERS

ASSOCIATION, a California Corporation

Plaintiffs,

By Fax

VILLAGES AT HERITAGE SPRINGS LLC.; a California Limited Liability Company; COMSTOCK HOMES BROKER, INC., a California Corporation; RCS-VILLAGES DEVELOPMENT, LLC.; a Colorado Limited Liability Company; COMSTOCK CROSSER & ASSOCIATES DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., a California Corporation; and DOES 1 THROUGH 1000, INCLUSIVE

Defendants.

S’N

Plaintiffs allege: