This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 04:22:40 (UTC).

THE THIRD FLOOR INC VS THE VIRTUAL REALITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/21/2017 THE THIRD FLOOR INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE VIRTUAL REALITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL and RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4350

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

THE THIRD FLOOR INC

THE THIRD FLOOR INC.

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 10

THE VIRTUAL REALITY COMPANY

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff

THE VIRTUAL REALITY COMPANY

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

THE THIRD FLOOR INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WEIMAN EDWARD E.

WEIMAN EDWARD ELLIS

Defendant Attorney

BALCH NOAH R.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT

11/21/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT

SUMMONS

11/21/2017: SUMMONS

Minute Order

12/15/2017: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by The Third Floor, Inc. (Plaintiff); The Third Floor, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 15; (Further Proceedings; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by The Third Floor, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by The Third Floor, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 309; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be non-Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-12-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by The Third Floor, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE THIRD FLOOR INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEIMAN EDWARD E.