This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 00:39:51 (UTC).

THE SYNOD OF BISHOPS OF THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH OUTSIDE OF RUSSIA, A NEW YORK 501 (C)(3) NON-PROFIT RELIGIOUS ORGANIZATIO VS OUR CHURCH BUILDING, INC., A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT RELIGIOUS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 THE SYNOD OF BISHOPS OF THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH OUTSIDE OF RUSSIA, A NEW YORK 501 C 3 NON-PROFIT RELIGIOUS ORGANIZATIO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against OUR CHURCH BUILDING, INC , A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT RELIGIOUS CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9887

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE SYNOD OF BISHOPS OF THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH OUTSIDE OF RUSSIA A NEW YORK 501 C3 NON-PROFIT RELIGIOUS ORGANIZATION

Defendants

PROTECTION OF THE HOLY VIRGIN THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT RELIGIOUS CORPORATION

OUR CHURCH BUILDING INC. A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT RELIGIOUS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENLINGER JUSTIN D

Defendant Attorney

GREGORY KEITH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

11/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

Case Management Statement

10/29/2020: Case Management Statement

Request for Judicial Notice

10/30/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS

10/30/2020: Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT OUR CHURCH BUILDING, INC.S MOTION FOR COMPLETE CONSOLIDATION OF LASC CASE NO. 18STCV09423 WITH LASC CASE NO 20STCV29887

10/30/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT OUR CHURCH BUILDING, INC.S MOTION FOR COMPLETE CONSOLIDATION OF LASC CASE NO. 18STCV09423 WITH LASC CASE NO 20STCV29887

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN D. DENLINGER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT OUR CHURCH BUILDING, INC.S MOTION FOR COMPLETE CONSOLIDATION OF LASC CASE NO. 18STCV09423 WITH LASC

10/30/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN D. DENLINGER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT OUR CHURCH BUILDING, INC.S MOTION FOR COMPLETE CONSOLIDATION OF LASC CASE NO. 18STCV09423 WITH LASC

Case Management Statement

11/4/2020: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SETTLEMENT & DISMISSAL

10/20/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SETTLEMENT & DISMISSAL

Objection - OBJECTION LIMITED OBJECTION TO STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT PROTECTION OF THE HOLY VIRGIN, THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH AND PLAINTIFFF THE SYNOD OF BISHOPS OF THE RUSSIAN ORTHOD

10/22/2020: Objection - OBJECTION LIMITED OBJECTION TO STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT PROTECTION OF THE HOLY VIRGIN, THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH AND PLAINTIFFF THE SYNOD OF BISHOPS OF THE RUSSIAN ORTHOD

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT OUR CHURCH BUILDING, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FILED UNDER LEAD CASE NUMBER 18STCV09423

10/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT OUR CHURCH BUILDING, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FILED UNDER LEAD CASE NUMBER 18STCV09423

Answer

10/7/2020: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

9/22/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/17/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/15/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT APPEAR BY VCOURT VIDEO CALL

9/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT APPEAR BY VCOURT VIDEO CALL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/11/2020: Case Management Statement

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, a New York 501 (c)(3) non-profit religious organization (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, a New York 501 (c)(3) non-profit religious organization (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Justin D. Denlinger in Support of Plaintiff?s Opposition to Defendant Our Church Building, Inc.?s Motion for Complete Consolidation of LASC Case No. 18STCV09423 with LASC Case No. 20STCV29887); Filed by The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, a New York 501 (c)(3) non-profit religious organization (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketObjection (Evidentiary Objections); Filed by The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, a New York 501 (c)(3) non-profit religious organization (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketOpposition (to Defendant Our Church Building, Inc.?s Motion for Complete Consolidation of LASC Case No. 18STCV09423 with LASC Case No 20STCV29887); Filed by The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, a New York 501 (c)(3) non-profit religious organization (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Our Church Building, Inc., a California non-profit religious corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketObjection (LIMITED OBJECTION TO STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT PROTECTION OF THE HOLY VIRGIN, THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH AND PLAINTIFFF THE SYNOD OF BISHOPS OF THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH OUTSIDE OF R); Filed by Our Church Building, Inc., a California non-profit religious corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, a New York 501 (c)(3) non-profit religious organization (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docketat 09:22 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 08/11/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/11/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, a New York 501 (c)(3) non-profit religious organization (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, a New York 501 (c)(3) non-profit religious organization (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, a New York 501 (c)(3) non-profit religious organization (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The Synod of Bishops of the Russian Orthodox Church Outside of Russia, a New York 501 (c)(3) non-profit religious organization (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less