This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/05/2021 at 15:05:39 (UTC).

THE STARK LIVING TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 14, 2000

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 THE STARK LIVING TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 14, 2000 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9103

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STARK BATYA

Not Classified By Court

THE STARK LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GELLER MICHAEL STEVEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • Hearing02/04/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition Of Beneficiaries ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GELLER MICHAEL STEVEN