This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2021 at 21:03:10 (UTC).

THE STAN HERMAN NONEXEMPT QTIP TRUST

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 THE STAN HERMAN NONEXEMPT QTIP TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4161

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HERMAN RYAN

RICKARD DOUGLAS

Not Classified By Court

TRUST THE STAN HERMAN NONEXEMPT QTIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MUNYER LINDSEY F.

KERENDIAN SHAWN S.

 

Court Documents

Notice - Notice of Withdrawal of Petition

6/10/2020: Notice - Notice of Withdrawal of Petition

Minute Order

10/20/2020: Minute Order

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Court Order Reconverting the Stan Herman Nonexempt QTIP Trust from Uni-Trust

6/2/2020: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Court Order Reconverting the Stan Herman Nonexempt QTIP Trust from Uni-Trust

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Withdrawal of Petition ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Court Order Reconverting the Stan Herman Nonexempt QTIP Trust from Uni-Trust ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUNYER LINDSEY F.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KERENDIAN SHAWN S.