This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2022 at 12:55:46 (UTC).

THE SOPER-MCCARTHY FAMILY TRUST, ET AL. VS EDISON INTERNATIONAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 THE SOPER-MCCARTHY FAMILY TRUST, filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against EDISON INTERNATIONAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8954

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARCHDALE DONALD GILBERT

CAMPBELL SALLY MARIE

DORIS EILEEN MILLARD REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

HOFFMAN TAYLOR

LEWIS KENNETH STEVEN

ORTIZ CHRISTINE M.

THE HEINO FAMILY TRUST AKA THE HEINO FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST

THE MAVROLAS REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

THE SOPER-MCCARTHY FAMILY TRUST

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOXER DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/6/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

9/6/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/6/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 09/20/2022

9/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 09/20/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

9/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 09/28/2022

9/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 09/28/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

9/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

10/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/9/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/9/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 3:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: The Soper-McCarthy Family Trust (Plaintiff); Christine M. Ortiz (Plaintiff); The Mavrolas Revocable Living Trust (Plaintiff); Doris Eileen Millard Revocable Living Trust (Plaintiff); Taylor Hoffman, (Plaintiff); The Heino Family Trust (Plaintiff); Kenneth Steven Lewis, (Plaintiff); Sally Marie Campbell, (Plaintiff); Sally Marie Campbell, (Plaintiff); Donald Gilbert Archdale, (Plaintiff); Sally Marie Campbell (Plaintiff); As to: Edison International (Defendant); Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Taylor Hoffman, (Plaintiff),The Mavrolas Revocable Living Trust (Plaintiff),Christine M. Ortiz (Plaintiff),Donald Gilbert Archdale, (Plaintiff),Sally Marie Campbell, (Plaintiff),The Heino Family Trust (Plaintiff),Kenneth Steven Lewis, (Plaintiff),Sally Marie Campbell, (Plaintiff),The Soper-McCarthy Family Trust (Plaintiff),Doris Eileen Millard Revocable Living Trust (Plaintiff),Sally Marie Campbell (Plaintiff); Result: Entered; Result Date: 11/09/2022; As To Parties changed from Southern California Edison (Defendant), Edison International (Defendant) to Southern California Edison (Defendant), Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: The Soper-McCarthy Family Trust (Plaintiff); Christine M. Ortiz (Plaintiff); The Mavrolas Revocable Living Trust (Plaintiff); Doris Eileen Millard Revocable Living Trust (Plaintiff); Taylor Hoffman, (Plaintiff); The Heino Family Trust (Plaintiff); Kenneth Steven Lewis, (Plaintiff); Sally Marie Campbell, (Plaintiff); Sally Marie Campbell, (Plaintiff); Donald Gilbert Archdale, (Plaintiff); Sally Marie Campbell (Plaintiff); As to: Edison International (Defendant); Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Christine M. Ortiz (Plaintiff),Sally Marie Campbell, (Plaintiff),Taylor Hoffman, (Plaintiff),The Soper-McCarthy Family Trust (Plaintiff),Sally Marie Campbell, (Plaintiff),Kenneth Steven Lewis, (Plaintiff),The Mavrolas Revocable Living Trust (Plaintiff),Donald Gilbert Archdale, (Plaintiff),The Heino Family Trust (Plaintiff),Sally Marie Campbell (Plaintiff),Doris Eileen Millard Revocable Living Trust (Plaintiff); Result: Entered; Result Date: 11/09/2022; As To Parties changed from Southern California Edison (Defendant), Edison International (Defendant) to Southern California Edison (Defendant), Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketAddress for Douglas Boxer (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Status Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/06/2022 03:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 09/20/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: The Soper-McCarthy Family Trust (Plaintiff); Christine M. Ortiz (Plaintiff); The Mavrolas Revocable Living Trust (Plaintiff); Doris Eileen Millard Revocable Living Trust (Plaintiff); Taylor Hoffman, (Plaintiff); The Heino Family Trust (Plaintiff); Kenneth Steven Lewis, (Plaintiff); Sally Marie Campbell, (Plaintiff); Sally Marie Campbell, (Plaintiff); Sally Marie Campbell (Plaintiff); Donald Gilbert Archdale, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: The Soper-McCarthy Family Trust (Plaintiff); Christine M. Ortiz (Plaintiff); The Mavrolas Revocable Living Trust (Plaintiff); Doris Eileen Millard Revocable Living Trust (Plaintiff); Taylor Hoffman, (Plaintiff); The Heino Family Trust (Plaintiff); Kenneth Steven Lewis, (Plaintiff); Sally Marie Campbell, (Plaintiff); Sally Marie Campbell, (Plaintiff); Sally Marie Campbell (Plaintiff); Donald Gilbert Archdale, (Plaintiff); As to: Edison International (Defendant); Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOXER DOUGLAS