This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2020 at 13:33:37 (UTC).

THE SHIRLEY KRAVITZ LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 THE SHIRLEY KRAVITZ LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7388

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

YOUNG KATHY ANNE

MARCUS ROBYN JO

Not Classified By Court

THE SHIRLEY KRAVITZ LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FELTEN JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Order - Granting Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property

3/25/2020: Order - Granting Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property

Supplement - to Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property

2/18/2020: Supplement - to Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property

Minute Order

2/26/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing

12/11/2019: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

10/16/2019: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing

8/27/2019: Notice - Hearing

Declaration - of Jeremy Marcus in Support of Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property

8/7/2019: Declaration - of Jeremy Marcus in Support of Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property; Verifications; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

8/7/2019: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property; Verifications; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Miscellaneous Document - Florida Authority in Support of Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property

8/7/2019: Miscellaneous Document - Florida Authority in Support of Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketOrder (Granting Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSupplement (to Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jeremy Marcus in Support of Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document (Florida Authority in Support of Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition to Determine and Confirm Trust's Interest in Property; Verifications; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELTEN JENNIFER