Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2021 at 01:59:00 (UTC).

THE SAN GABRIEL VALLEY COUNCIL OF GOVERNMENTS, IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ALAMEDA CORRIDOR-EAST CONSTRUCTION PROJECT VS LUIS RAMIREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 THE SAN GABRIEL VALLEY COUNCIL OF GOVERNMENTS, IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ALAMEDA CORRIDOR-EAST CONSTRUCTION PROJECT filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against LUIS RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY and CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2704

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE SAN GABRIEL VALLEY COUNCIL OF GOVERNMENTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ALAMEDA CORRIDOR-EAST CONSTRUCTION PROJECT

Defendants

LOS ANGELES COUNTY FIRE DEPARTMENT

OTANI TETSUO

OTANI YAEKO

OTANI RADIATOR-AUTO SVC. INC.. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA OTANI RADIATOR AUTO PERFORMANCE & AUTO SERVICE

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

OTANI RADIATOR AUTO PERFORMANCE

VEGA SMOG TEST & REPAIR

RAMIREZ LUIS

RAMIREZ LEONARDO

MURILLO EUDALDO DBA VEGA SMOG TEST AND REPAIR

LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

EUDALDO MURILLO VEGA

VEGA SALVADOR DBA VEGA SMOG TEST AND REPAIR

VEGA EUDALDO DBA VEGA SMOG TEST ONLY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

OTANI RADIATOR-AUTO SVC. INC. DBA OTANI RADIATOR AUTO PERFORMANCE & AUTO SERVICE

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES DOE 2

VEGA DOE 1 SALVADOR DBA VEGA SMOG TEST AND REPAIR

VEGA EUDALDO MURILLO DBA VEGA SMOG TEST AND REPAIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SOZIO ALAN A

SOZIO ALAN A.

Defendant Attorneys

FISHER JAMIE

JACOBSON LAURA T.

FISHER J. JAMIE

STARRETT AMY E. ESQ.

STARRETT AMY E.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING(S) DUE TO CO...)

4/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING(S) DUE TO CO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING(S) DUE TO CO...) OF 04/20/2020

4/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING(S) DUE TO CO...) OF 04/20/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES;) OF 04/30/2020

4/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES;) OF 04/30/2020

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION REGARDING DATE OF VALUE FOR DEFENDANTS CLAIM FOR LOSS OF BUSINESS GOODWILL

3/11/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION REGARDING DATE OF VALUE FOR DEFENDANTS CLAIM FOR LOSS OF BUSINESS GOODWILL

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

1/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT

10/28/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT RAMIREZ'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSIT

10/31/2019: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT RAMIREZ'S APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSIT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

10/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 10/09/2019, ORDER

10/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 10/09/2019, ORDER

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT

10/9/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

10/9/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT ...)

10/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT ...)

Notice of Ruling

9/30/2019: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION OF VALUE OF MICHAEL A. LACEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER OF PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION AND CERTIFICATION OF TAX INFORMATION

7/3/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF VALUE OF MICHAEL A. LACEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER OF PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION AND CERTIFICATION OF TAX INFORMATION

Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

7/3/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

Declaration - DECLARATION DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST BY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

8/7/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST BY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED FIRE PROTECTION DISTRICT OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY

8/14/2019: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED FIRE PROTECTION DISTRICT OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) (AMENDED)

8/19/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) (AMENDED)

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • Hearing09/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Hearing09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Hearing08/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE); Filed by The San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-east Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by The San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-east Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial ((time estimate5 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by The San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-east Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Value of Michael a. Lacey in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Prejudgment Possession and Certification of Tax Information); Filed by The San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-east Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Value of Thomas M. Pike in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Prejudgment Possession and Certification of Tax Information); Filed by The San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-east Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketMotion for Order (Of Prejudgment Possession and Certification of Tax Information; Memorandum Of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Alan a. Sozio, Andres Ramirez); Filed by The San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-east Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketNotice (of deposit); Filed by The San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-east Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-east Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-east Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Lis Pendens); Filed by The San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-east Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The San Gabriel Valley Council Of Governments, In Furtherance Of The Alameda Corridor-east Construction Project (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN GABRIEL VALLEY COUNCIL OF GOVERNMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOZIO ALAN