This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2022 at 22:00:17 (UTC).

THE SABATH FAMILY TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 2, 1997, AS AMENDED AND RESTATED JULY 17,

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 THE SABATH FAMILY TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 2, 1997, AS AMENDED AND RESTATED JULY 17 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0059

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SABATH RICHARD

Not Classified By Court

THE SABATH FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

STEIN MATTHEW G

MAZDA MARK NICHOLAS

PARVIZ KIANNA CHRISTINA

Not Classified By Court Attorney

THOMAS ANDREW JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice - Ruling

6/6/2022: Notice - Ruling

Minute Order

6/1/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name

5/4/2022: Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name

Notice - Association of Counsel

5/17/2022: Notice - Association of Counsel

Order

4/13/2022: Order

Ex Parte Opposition - $60 - PETITIONER RICHARD SABATH???S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT???S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE APRIL 13, 2022, OSC HEARING BY TWO WEEKS BASED ON MEDICAL CONDITION OF COUNSEL

4/13/2022: Ex Parte Opposition - $60 - PETITIONER RICHARD SABATH???S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT???S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE APRIL 13, 2022, OSC HEARING BY TWO WEEKS BASED ON MEDICAL CONDITION OF COUNSEL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KIANNA C. PARVIZ, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER RICHARD SABATH???S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT???S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE APRIL 13, 2022, OSC HEARING BY TWO WEEKS B

4/13/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KIANNA C. PARVIZ, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER RICHARD SABATH???S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT???S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE APRIL 13, 2022, OSC HEARING BY TWO WEEKS B

Minute Order

4/13/2022: Minute Order

Exhibit List - PETITIONER RICHARD SABATH'S EXHIBIT LIST FOR APRIL 13, 2022 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING CONTEMPT

4/13/2022: Exhibit List - PETITIONER RICHARD SABATH'S EXHIBIT LIST FOR APRIL 13, 2022 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING CONTEMPT

Ex Parte - Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

4/12/2022: Ex Parte - Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Declaration - of Kianna C. Parviz

12/13/2021: Declaration - of Kianna C. Parviz

Request - Judicial Notice

12/14/2021: Request - Judicial Notice

Declaration - Declaration of Richard Sabath in support of Petitioner's ex parte application

12/14/2021: Declaration - Declaration of Richard Sabath in support of Petitioner's ex parte application

Declaration - Declaration of Kianna C. Parviz, Esq.

12/14/2021: Declaration - Declaration of Kianna C. Parviz, Esq.

Ex Parte - Petition ($200.00)

12/14/2021: Ex Parte - Petition ($200.00)

Ex Parte - Opposition ($200)

12/15/2021: Ex Parte - Opposition ($200)

Ex Parte - Order

12/21/2021: Ex Parte - Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD SABATH IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER RICHARD SABATH S MOTION

12/28/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RICHARD SABATH IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER RICHARD SABATH S MOTION

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • Hearing06/29/2022 at 1:30 PM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause re: Contempt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice - Ruling; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Contempt - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice - Association of Counsel; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNotice - Change of Address/Firm Name; Filed by Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Contempt - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF KIANNA C. PARVIZ, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER RICHARD SABATH???S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT???S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE APRIL 13, 2022, OSC HEARING BY TWO WEEKS BASED ON MEDICAL CONDITION OF COUNSEL (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) filed on December 3, 2020 by Richard Sabath. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSupplement (VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT REGARDING PROBATE NOTES (REVIEWED 4 15 21) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) ((1) Compel Trustee To Account... ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAZDA MARK N. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARVIZ KIANNA CHRISTINA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEIN MATTHEW G