This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 04:38:09 (UTC).

THE ROMARIC TRUST

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 THE ROMARIC TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KLEIN, CLIFFORD and ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5333

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

 

Party Details

Petitioners

PUNI MARLA

BOYERS ROBERTA

Respondents

IKATU FOUNDATION

GLOBAL ENT OUTREACH

WAGNER YULIA YERESHENKO

WAGNER RICHARD

Not Classified By Court

THE ROMARIC TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

AIN FARRIS ELIAS

MELNICK CLIFF

REAGAN CASEY ALAN

TAYLOR JOSHUA D.

KERENDIAN SHAWN S.

Respondent Attorney

HUNTER JOHN LOGAN

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial)

7/10/2020: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial)

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - First Amended Petition for Removal

9/30/2020: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - First Amended Petition for Removal

Minute Order

11/30/2020: Minute Order

Request - Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

1/20/2021: Request - Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION

1/20/2021: Demurrer - NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION

Demurrer

1/20/2021: Demurrer

Request - Judicial Notice

1/20/2021: Request - Judicial Notice

Minute Order

2/22/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/3/2021: Minute Order

Reply - RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

5/27/2021: Reply - RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Opposition - Opposition to Demurrer

5/19/2021: Opposition - Opposition to Demurrer

Objection - Evidentiary Objections to Respondents' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer

5/19/2021: Objection - Evidentiary Objections to Respondents' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer

Notice

5/10/2021: Notice

Minute Order

6/2/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order - Demurrer- Off Calendar, duplicate

6/2/2021: Minute Order - Demurrer- Off Calendar, duplicate

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • Hearing07/14/2021 at 3:00 PM in Probate Department 79 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Demurrer Hearing - Not Held - Calendared in Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79; Demurrer Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Rosenbloom, Jonathan L, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) (First Amended Petition for Removal ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNTER JOHN LOGAN ESQ.