This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 01:12:29 (UTC).

THE ROBERT A. MILLIKAN FELLOWSHIP FUND - IN THE MATTER OF

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 THE ROBERT A MILLIKAN FELLOWSHIP FUND - IN THE MATTER OF was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3395

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY

Not Classified By Court

THE ROBERT A. MILLIKAN FELLOWSHIP FUND

Interested Party

OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Decedent

MILLIKAN GRETA B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

NEWMAN DAVID WHEELER

KRASILOVSKY SETH WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Declaration

4/9/2021: Declaration

Petition - Authority - Petition For Modification Of Restrictions Contained in Gift Instrument

4/9/2021: Petition - Authority - Petition For Modification Of Restrictions Contained in Gift Instrument

Notice - Hearing

5/7/2021: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Related Cases - 21STPB03396

5/3/2021: Notice - Related Cases - 21STPB03396

Notice - Attorney Generals Notice of Non Opposition to Petitions

8/25/2021: Notice - Attorney Generals Notice of Non Opposition to Petitions

Notice

8/18/2021: Notice

Declaration - to Clear Probate Note

8/18/2021: Declaration - to Clear Probate Note

Minute Order

7/28/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/27/2021: Minute Order

Order

11/9/2021: Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF URGENCY REGARDING SIGNING OF PROPOSED ORDER

10/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF URGENCY REGARDING SIGNING OF PROPOSED ORDER

Notice

11/9/2021: Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketOrder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF URGENCY REGARDING SIGNING OF PROPOSED ORDER ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Subject

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Authority Hearing (Non-Trust) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Subject

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (Attorney Generals Notice of Non Opposition to Petitions ); Filed by Interested Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (to Clear Probate Note ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice - Related Cases (21STPB03396 ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPetition - Authority (Petition For Modification Of Restrictions Contained in Gift Instrument ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less