This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2022 at 06:27:15 (UTC).

THE PROTECT OUR COMMUNITIES FOUNDATION VS STATE WATER RESOURCES CONTROL BOARD

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 THE PROTECT OUR COMMUNITIES FOUNDATION filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against STATE WATER RESOURCES CONTROL BOARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA JESSNER, DAVID J. COWAN and JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3192

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA JESSNER

DAVID J. COWAN

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE PROTECT OUR COMMUNITIES FOUNDATION

Respondents

STATE WATER RESOURCES CONTROL BOARD

AES SOUTHLAND ENERGY HOLDINGS II LLC

AES ALAMITOS L.L.C.

AES HUNTINGTON BEACH L.L.C.

AES REDONDO BEACH L.L.C.

SLH FUND LLC

Interested Parties

PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY

AES SOUTHLAND ENERGY LLC

ORMOND BEACH POWER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DICKENSON MALINDA

Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

HOWELL PETER

KATZ ERIC MEYER

FORGIE JULIA KATHRYN

FORGIE JULIA

HARRIS JEFFERY DONALD

KRASKA DAVID THOMAS

NEUMYER SAMANTHA GONG

DONNELLY THOMAS M.

GRADY SHAWNDA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

1/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Judgment

1/13/2022: Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: JUDGMENT) OF 01/13/2022, NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT

1/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: JUDGMENT) OF 01/13/2022, NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: JUDGMENT)

1/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: JUDGMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT WITH RELATED CASE) OF 01/20/2022

1/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT WITH RELATED CASE) OF 01/20/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT WITH RELATED CASE)

1/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT WITH RELATED CASE)

Reply - REPLY BRIEF BY THE PROTECT OUR COMMUNITIES FOUNDATION IN SUPPORT OF THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

10/20/2021: Reply - REPLY BRIEF BY THE PROTECT OUR COMMUNITIES FOUNDATION IN SUPPORT OF THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA AND ERRATA TO OPENING AND REPLY BRIEFS BY THE PROTECT OUR COMMUNITIES FOUNDATION IN SUPPORT OF THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

10/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA AND ERRATA TO OPENING AND REPLY BRIEFS BY THE PROTECT OUR COMMUNITIES FOUNDATION IN SUPPORT OF THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

Notice - NOTICE OF LODGMENT BY THE PROTECT OUR COMMUNITIES FOUNDATION

10/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF LODGMENT BY THE PROTECT OUR COMMUNITIES FOUNDATION

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

11/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN PARTIES AND [PROPOSED ORDER]

11/3/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN PARTIES AND [PROPOSED ORDER]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)

11/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)

11/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

11/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Order - DECISION ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE: DENIED

11/24/2021: Order - DECISION ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE: DENIED

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 11/24/2021, DECISION ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

11/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 11/24/2021, DECISION ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

Joinder - JOINDER JOINDER OF REAL PARTY IN INTEREST PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY IN THE OPPOSITION BRIEF BY REAL PARTY IN INTEREST ORMOND BEACH POWER, LLC

9/20/2021: Joinder - JOINDER JOINDER OF REAL PARTY IN INTEREST PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY IN THE OPPOSITION BRIEF BY REAL PARTY IN INTEREST ORMOND BEACH POWER, LLC

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BRIEF OF REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST AES, ET AL.

9/20/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BRIEF OF REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST AES, ET AL.

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • Docketat 2:16 PM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Case) of 01/20/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment with Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Judgment) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by State Water Resources Control Board (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Judgment) of 01/13/2022, Notice of Entry of Judgment and Judgment); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by State Water Resources Control Board (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by The Protect Our Communities Foundation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Assignment; and Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon); Filed by The Protect Our Communities Foundation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by The Protect Our Communities Foundation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Election to Prepare Administrative Record); Filed by The Protect Our Communities Foundation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 11:45 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re CEQA Assignment) of 10/06/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re CEQA Assignment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The Protect Our Communities Foundation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by The Protect Our Communities Foundation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AES SOUTHLAND ENERGY HOLDINGS II LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AES HUNTINGTON BEACH L.L.C. is a litigant