This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2023 at 10:33:58 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS ONE HUNDRED ONE THOUSAND DOLLARS ($101,000.00) IN U.S. CURRENCY,

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against ONE HUNDRED ONE THOUSAND DOLLARS 101,000 00 IN U S CURRENCY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3480

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Claimant

GUADANA AGUILAR ANDRES

Respondent

ONE HUNDRED ONE THOUSAND DOLLARS $101 000.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PAK GRACE

Claimant Attorney

SEVERO MICHAEL VINCENT

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/5/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

5/5/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

5/5/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

5/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Proof of Service by Mail

4/19/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Claim Opposing Forfeiture

4/3/2023: Claim Opposing Forfeiture

Proof of Service by Mail

3/3/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

3/1/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SCHEDU...)

2/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SCHEDU...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SCHEDU...) OF 02/27/2023

2/27/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SCHEDU...) OF 02/27/2023

Order - ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/27/2023: Order - ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT; DECLARATION OF GRACE PAK

2/24/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT; DECLARATION OF GRACE PAK

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

2/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Proof of Publication

10/27/2022: Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication

10/27/2022: Proof of Publication

Proof of Service by Mail

10/6/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/28/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • Hearing06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: The People of The State of California (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: The People of The State of California (Petitioner); As to: Andres Guadana Aguilar (Claimant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: The People of The State of California (Petitioner); As to: ONE HUNDRED ONE THOUSAND DOLLARS ($101,000.00) IN U.S. CURRENCY, (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69 updated: Result Date to 05/02/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: The People of The State of California (Petitioner); As to: Andres Guadana Aguilar (Claimant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketClaim Opposing Forfeiture; Filed by: Andres Guadana Aguilar (Claimant); Amount Claimed: 101000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: The People of The State of California (Petitioner); As to: ONE HUNDRED ONE THOUSAND DOLLARS ($101,000.00) IN U.S. CURRENCY, (Respondent); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Department 69 online courtroom information. Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: The People of The State of California (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William F. Fahey in Department 69 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketPetition PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ. Filed by: The People of The State of California (Petitioner); As to: ONE HUNDRED ONE THOUSAND DOLLARS ($101,000.00) IN U.S. CURRENCY, (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less