This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/01/2021 at 03:20:31 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS MICHAEL KWAN HO NG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MICHAEL KWAN HO NG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7807

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

WONGS USA INVESTMENT GROUP LLC AKA KUSH KINGZ AKA KUSH KINGS AKA KUSH KORNER 25 CAP

ALPINE COMMERCIAL GROUP LLC AKA THE LAB AKA BROADWAY 20 CAP AKA 215 COLLECTIVE

1 THROUGH 100 DOES

WONG INDIVIDUALLY AND AS MEMBER OF BROADWAY HK LLC AKA THE LAB BROADWAY 20 CAP OR 215 COLLECTIVE CHOI YU

NG MICHAEL KWAN HO DBA ALPINE COMMERCIAL GROUP LLC AKA THE LAB BROADWAY 20 CAP OR 215 COLLECTIVE DBA BROADWAY HK LLC AKA THE LAB BROADWAY 20 CAP OR 215 COLLECTIVE DBA WONGS USA INVESTMENT GROUP LLC AKA KUSH KINGZ KUSH KINGS OR KUSH KORNER 2

BROADWAY HK LLC AKA THE LAB AKA BROADWAY 20 CAP ALIAS 215 COLLECTIVE

LE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS EMPLOYEE OF ALPINE COMMERCIAL GROUP LLC AKA THE LAB BROADWAY 20 CAP OR 215 COLLECTIVE BROADWAY HK LLC AKA THE LAB BROADWAY 20 CAP OR 215 COLLECTIVE AND WONGS USA INVESTMENT GROUP LLC AKA KUSH KINGZ KUSH KINGS OR KU CHRISTINE H

TRUONG INDIVIDUALLY AS MEMBER OF ALPINE COMMERCIAL GROUP LLC AKA THE LAB BROADWAY 20 CAP OR 215 COLLECTIVE LONG DBA BROADWAY HK LLC AKA THE LAB BROADWAY 20 CAP OR 215 COLLECTIVE

ALPINE COMMERCIAL GROUP AKA ALPINE COMMERCIAL GROUP LLC DBA THE LAB BROADWAY 20 CAP OR 215 COLLECTIVE

ALPINE COMMERCIAL GROUP LLC AKA ALPINE COMMERCIAL GROUP LLC DBA THE LAB BROADWAY 20 CAP OR 215 COLLECTIVE

BROADWAY HK LLC DBA THE LAB BROADWAY 20 CAP OR 215 COLLECTIVE AKA BROADWAY 20 CAP ALIAS 215 COLLECTIVE

LE CHRISTINE H. AKA ALPINE COMMERICIAL GROUP LLC DBA THE LAB BROADWAY 20 CAP OR 215 COLLECTIVE

TRUONG LONG AKA ALPINE COMMERICIAL GROUP LLC DBA THE LAB BROADWAY 20 CAP OR 215 COLLECTIVE

WONG CHOI YU DBA THE LAB BROADWAY 20 CAP OR 215 COLLECTIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAM JENNIFER ANN

LAM JENNIFER A.

Defendant Attorneys

SEELEY RONALD J.

MOROS KONSTADINOS T.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO STAY CIVIL PROCEEDINGS

10/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO STAY CIVIL PROCEEDINGS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/26/2021

10/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/29/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

10/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/29/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

Application - APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APP FOR DEFAULT

10/5/2021: Application - APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APP FOR DEFAULT

Request for Judicial Notice

10/12/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Stay of Proceedings

10/12/2021: Motion for Stay of Proceedings

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

10/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/1/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Judicial Notice

10/4/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Stay of Proceedings

10/4/2021: Motion for Stay of Proceedings

Notice of Continuance

10/4/2021: Notice of Continuance

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/5/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER LAM

10/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER LAM

Application - APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

10/5/2021: Application - APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE D...)

10/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE D...)

Order - ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT

10/6/2021: Order - ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 10/29/2021, Final Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docketat 10:15 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docketat 10:15 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 4:18 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (PROOF OF SERVICE OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MD, WONG DR. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRUONG INDIVIDUALLY AND YEN BACH DBA A AND B AUTO BODY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAM JENNIFER ANN