This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 00:24:31 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS MAGIC BLUE LLC ET A

Case Summary

On 05/02/2018 a Contract - Business case was filed by THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA against MAGIC BLUE LLC ET A in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4461

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Respondents and Defendants

MAGIC BLUE LLC

MELCHOR CATALINA CAMPOS

DE LA LUZ JOSE ANTONIO BONIFACIO VASQUEZ

DOES 1 TO 50

VASQUEZ JOSE

 

Court Documents

Notice

1/22/2019: Notice

COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTION, CIVIL PENALTIES: BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE 17200

5/2/2018: COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTION, CIVIL PENALTIES: BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE 17200

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/10/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/27/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

11/15/2018: Minute Order

Register of Action

5/17/2018: Register of Action

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS MAGIC BLUE, LLC, CATALINE CAMPOS MELCHOR AND JOSE ANTONIO BONIFACIO VASQUEZ DE LA LUZ TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF

6/15/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS MAGIC BLUE, LLC, CATALINE CAMPOS MELCHOR AND JOSE ANTONIO BONIFACIO VASQUEZ DE LA LUZ TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF

Certificate of Mailing for

2/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Proof of Service by Mail

3/20/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order

1/28/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

4/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/16/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

9/17/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/9/2019: Minute Order

Notice

2/21/2019: Notice

Stipulation for Judgment

2/5/2019: Stipulation for Judgment

SUMMONS

5/2/2018: SUMMONS

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 19; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 10:18 AM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 04/11/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by The People of The State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Order (Court Order to Release U.S. Currency Pursuant to a Stipulated Judgment); Filed by The People of The State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Notice (Of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by The People of The State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • at 2:25 PM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/11/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by The People of The State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Register of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by The People of The State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by The People of The State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by The People of The State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTION, CIVIL PENALTIES: BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE 17200

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.