This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 08:40:57 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS HOVO STEPANIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HOVO STEPANIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4201

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

STEPANIAN HOVO AKA OGANES STEPANIAN

1 THROUGH 50 DOES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ JOSEPH L.

Defendant Attorney

AZARYAN ARNAK

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF RECORDING OF STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERM INJ. AND ORDER TO RECORD

3/24/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF RECORDING OF STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND PERM INJ. AND ORDER TO RECORD

Stipulated Judgment

1/21/2022: Stipulated Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/28/2022

1/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/28/2022

Substitution of Attorney

1/24/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

12/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

10/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Case Management Statement

6/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Lis Pendens

4/21/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

3/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/2/2021: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/2/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Recording of Stipulated Final Judgment and Perm Inj. and Order to Record); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docketat 3:58 PM in Department 58; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/28/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Hovo Stepanian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketStipulated Judgment; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hovo Stepanian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ JOSEPH L.