This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2022 at 02:19:22 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS HOMETOWN INN, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HOMETOWN INN, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2609

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

1 THROUGH 50 DOES

HOMETOWN INN LP.

WANG DIANE

WANG GERALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ JOSEPH L.

Defendant Attorney

HALLOCK KAREN LEE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

4/29/2022: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/12/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE CASE REASSIGNMENT

5/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE CASE REASSIGNMENT

Case Management Statement

5/13/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/29/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

11/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

11/24/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/13/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RECORDING OF LIS PENDENS

1/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RECORDING OF LIS PENDENS

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/14/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/14/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • Hearing05/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNotice (Case Reassignment); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Hometown Inn, LP. (Defendant); Gerald Wang (Defendant); Diane Wang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Hometown Inn, LP. (Defendant); Gerald Wang (Defendant); Diane Wang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Recording of Lis Pendens); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hometown Inn, LP. (Defendant); Gerald Wang (Defendant); Diane Wang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOMETOWN INN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ JOSEPH L.