This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 00:24:49 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS DETROIT TED DUMAS, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DETROIT TED DUMAS, JR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3739

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

DUMAS KEIJUAN TED

1 THROUGH 50 DOES

DUMAS ALEXANDER OMEGA

DUMAS DETROIT TED JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ JOSEPH L.

Defendant Attorney

NEHORAY MAC E

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE;)

2/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RECORDING OF STIP. PRELIM INJUNCTION, AND ORDER TO RECORD

1/7/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RECORDING OF STIP. PRELIM INJUNCTION, AND ORDER TO RECORD

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/22/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/22/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/22/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE;)

8/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROPOSED STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER TO RECORD

8/9/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROPOSED STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER TO RECORD

Case Management Statement

8/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Lis Pendens

4/19/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Lis Pendens

4/21/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Answer

5/4/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

5/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

5/12/2021: Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

5/12/2021: Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

5/12/2021: Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Complaint

1/29/2021: Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • Hearing05/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Hearing05/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Further Status Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Recording of Stip. Prelim Injunction, and Order to Record); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ JOSEPH L.