Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2021 at 08:30:00 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL. VS CROWN CASTLE NG WEST, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CROWN CASTLE NG WEST, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5191

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES BOARD OF SUPERVISORS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC

SHERIDAN NANCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELLIS JOSEPH L.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SHONAFELT MICHAEL W

TALAVERA STEPHANIE L.

CARUSO JASON MOBERLY

SHONAFELT MICHAEL W.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

2/19/2021: Notice of Settlement

Order - REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE

1/19/2021: Order - REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND TO CONTINUE...) OF 11/12/2020

11/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND TO CONTINUE...) OF 11/12/2020

Order - ORDER REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE

4/23/2020: Order - ORDER REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 03/02/2020

3/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 03/02/2020

Separate Statement

2/13/2020: Separate Statement

Reply - REPLY ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / ADJUDICATION

2/13/2020: Reply - REPLY ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / ADJUDICATION

Separate Statement

2/4/2020: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY SHERIDAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION AS TO DEFENDANTS CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC AND NANCY SHERIDAN

11/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY SHERIDAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION AS TO DEFENDANTS CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC AND NANCY SHERIDAN

Separate Statement

11/27/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON MOBERLY CARUSO IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING FILING OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/12/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON MOBERLY CARUSO IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING FILING OF CROSS-COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

8/12/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING OF PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIM FILED IN FEDERAL COURT ON JANUARY 16, 2019

6/26/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING OF PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIM FILED IN FEDERAL COURT ON JANUARY 16, 2019

Case Management Statement

6/6/2019: Case Management Statement

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER

5/20/2019: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND CROSS-DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF JOSEPH MELLIS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHO

5/22/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND CROSS-DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF JOSEPH MELLIS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHO

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint

11/15/2018: Complaint

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((2-days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff); County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 4:15 PM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case;) of 02/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((2-days)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOrder (Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Removal to the U.S. District C...) of 03/26/2019 and copy of 03-26-19 minute order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER OF REMAND); Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff); County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Remand from Federal Court; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Crown Castle NG West, LLC (Defendant); Nancy Sheridan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff); County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff); County of Los Angeles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHONAFELT MICHAEL W

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Moberly Caruso