This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2023 at 10:01:24 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION VS CIRCLE K STORES INC., A TEXAS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CIRCLE K STORES INC , A TEXAS CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1063

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

CIRCLE K STORES INC.

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHO ANDY KWANG SUK

 

Court Documents

Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

5/24/2023: Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/15/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/11/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER FOR POSSESSION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF GREGORY FARR, DAN MURDOCH AND ANDY K. CHO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

5/1/2023: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER FOR POSSESSION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF GREGORY FARR, DAN MURDOCH AND ANDY K. CHO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/28/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/19/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT AND SUMMARY OF THE BASE FOR THE APPRAISAL

4/27/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT AND SUMMARY OF THE BASE FOR THE APPRAISAL

Proof of Personal Service

4/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...) OF 03/20/2023

3/20/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...) OF 03/20/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

3/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/3/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Lis Pendens - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS [AMENDED]

2/1/2023: Notice of Lis Pendens - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS [AMENDED]

Notice of Lis Pendens

1/18/2023: Notice of Lis Pendens

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/17/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/17/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2023
  • Hearing08/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Prejudgment Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Why Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $500.00 Should Not be Imposed as to Plaintiff and Their Counsel for Failure to Appear on 03/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Andy Kwang Suk Cho (Attorney): First Name changed from Andy to Andy Kwang; Organization Name changed from Department of Transportation to DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION; Middle Name changed from K. to Suk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDisclaimer Of Interest; Filed by: The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties changed from Circle K Stores Inc. (Defendant) to Circle K Stores Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: The People of the State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Circle K Stores Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Date: 05/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: The People of the State of California (Plaintiff); As to: Circle K Stores Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Date: 05/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Order Prejudgment Possession scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 07/11/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff); As to: CIRCLE K STORES INC., a Texas corporation (Defendant); EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION, a New York corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff); As to: CIRCLE K STORES INC., a Texas corporation (Defendant); EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION, a New York corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Plaintiff); As to: CIRCLE K STORES INC., a Texas corporation (Defendant); EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION, a New York corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less