This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2019 at 00:26:04 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIF VS JAMES R BOX SR ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIF filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JAMES R BOX SR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9136

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA THE

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

ELIAS DEBORAH ANNE

BOX DEBORAH A.

BOX MICHAEL ALLEN

BOX JAMES ROBERT JR.

BOX JAMES R. SR.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

BOX DEBORAH A. AKA DEBORAH ANNE ELIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

GONZALEZ JOSEPH L.

Defendant Attorney

MARTINEZ FELIX JOSE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

5/7/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/7/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/7/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/7/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/7/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

4/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

2/19/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Answer - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEBORAH BOX

3/26/2019: Answer - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEBORAH BOX

Answer

3/18/2019: Answer

Answer

3/18/2019: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/18/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/18/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice - Notice of Recording of Stipulated Preliminary Injunction and Order to Record

3/5/2019: Notice - Notice of Recording of Stipulated Preliminary Injunction and Order to Record

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANTS DEB...)

3/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANTS DEB...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) [proposed] stipulated Preliminary Injunction and Order to Record

2/13/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) [proposed] stipulated Preliminary Injunction and Order to Record

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

2/7/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order [Proposed] Stipulated Preliminary Injunction and Order to Record

2/13/2019: Stipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order [Proposed] Stipulated Preliminary Injunction and Order to Record

Proof of Service by Mail

2/4/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • Hearing01/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Hearing01/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (following settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal following settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default as to defendants Deborah A. Box, James Robert Box, Jr., and Michael Allen Box) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR ABATEMENT AND INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by The People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ JOSEPH L.