This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2022 at 14:30:04 (UTC).

THE MUSIC FORCE, LLC VS SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 THE MUSIC FORCE, LLC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0369

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE MUSIC FORCE LLC

Defendant

SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAPIRO MICHAEL RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

NIBORSKI MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/16/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/16/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

4/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

4/25/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Answer

4/22/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SONY MUSIC ENTERTAINMENT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by THE MUSIC FORCE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by THE MUSIC FORCE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by THE MUSIC FORCE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by THE MUSIC FORCE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MUSIC FORCE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony Music Entertainment Italy S.p.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPIRO MICHAEL RICHARD