This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 18:26:40 (UTC).

THE MATTER OF CECILIA L. BETANCOURT SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 THE MATTER OF CECILIA L BETANCOURT SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8311

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MOCK TIMOTHY

Not Classified By Court

THE MATTER OF CECILIA L. BETANCOURT SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BROUSARD JILL ANNETTE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Acct or Order in Crt Created Trust (Initial) - Petition by trustee to establish trust's claim of ownership

8/25/2021: Petition - Acct or Order in Crt Created Trust (Initial) - Petition by trustee to establish trust's claim of ownership

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

9/10/2021: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Minute Order

1/12/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/7/2022: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement to Petition

4/4/2022: Supplement - Supplement to Petition

Notice - Hearing

4/4/2022: Notice - Hearing

Notice - Hearing

2/22/2022: Notice - Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement to Petition ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketPetition - Acct or Order in Crt Created Trust (Initial) (Petition by trustee to establish trust's claim of ownership ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROUSARD JILL ANNETTE