This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2020 at 06:15:37 (UTC).

THE MATIAN FIRM, APC VS RIOS, DOMINGO

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 THE MATIAN FIRM, APC filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against RIOS, DOMINGO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SANCHEZ DUFOUR, ROBERT E.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6476

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SANCHEZ DUFOUR, ROBERT E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE MATIAN FIRM APC

Respondent

RIOS DOMINGO

Other

ESPINOZA BRYANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHARPE DANIEL CHRISTIAN

 

Court Documents

Response - Workplace Violence

12/9/2020: Response - Workplace Violence

Proof of Service - Mail

12/9/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

12/14/2020: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Minute Order

12/14/2020: Minute Order

Petition - Workplace Violence

11/25/2020: Petition - Workplace Violence

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

11/25/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

11/25/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketResponse - Workplace Violence; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less